HI HCR143 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Human Services, Department Of Health, And Judiciary To Prioritize Ensuring That Contracts For Government Services Are Adequately Resourced To Cover The Costs Of Providing Those Services.
Title
Urging The Department Of Human Services, Department Of Health, And Judiciary To Prioritize Ensuring That Contracts For Government Services Are Adequately Resourced To Cover The Costs Of Providing Those Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Chun [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 717). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-19-24. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3871) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 04-15-24 3:03PM; Conference Room 225. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-11-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 627). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1711-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR125 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.