HI HCR150 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Public Utilities Commission To Act In The Public Interest Regarding Solar Energy Interconnection, And To Not Be Influenced By Pressure From A Regulated Utility.
Title
PUC; Solar Energy; HEI; Electricity Rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-24-15 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=150&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR150_.HTM |