HI HCR150 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of The Auditor To Conduct An Audit Of The Civil Rights Compliance Office Of The Department Of Education.
Title
Department of Education; Civil Rights Compliance Office; Audit
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Andria Tupola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1412-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Ing, Kong, Tupola. |
2016-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |