HI HCR151 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to HEA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to HEA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting Access To Debt-free Higher Education At Public Colleges And Universities.
Title
Resolution Supporting Access to Debt-Free Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 448). |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1564-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:15PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-18 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR103 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=151&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR151_.HTM |