HI HCR151 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of Exempting All State-related Construction From County Permitting Requirements And Establishing A Permitting Division Within The Department To Be Responsible For Permitting Services For All State-related Construction.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of Exempting All State-related Construction From County Permitting Requirements And Establishing A Permitting Division Within The Department To Be Responsible For Permitting Services For All State-related Construction.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. May Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR130 (Same As) 2024-04-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=151&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HCR151_.HTM |