HI HCR156 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Department Of Education To Convene A Task Force To Assess The Hawaii Common Core Standards And Develop Alternative State-based Educational Standards.
Title
Department of Education Task Force; Common Core Alternatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2015-03-25 | House | Re-referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR94 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 33
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=156&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR156_.HTM |