HI HCR157 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Insurance Division Of The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Collaborate With The Medical Professional Community On A Survey To Determine The Extent Of The Development Of Accountable Care Organizations And Direct Primary Care Or Concierge Medicine Within The Community And The Impact Of These Business Arrangements On The Ability Of Patients To Access Primary Care Services In The State.
Title
Accountable Care Organizations; Direct Primary Care; Concierge Medicine; Insurance Division
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 663). |
2016-04-27 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-27 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-04-21 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 676) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-21-16. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3670) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 451). |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1570-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from HLT/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1423-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, Yamane. |
2016-03-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-28-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-28-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/CPC on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:35PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR108 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.