HI HCR158 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Sister-state Committee To Evaluate And Develop Recommendations For The Initiation Of A Sister-state Relationship Between The State Of Hawaii And The State Of Dakhla Of The Region Of Oued Ed-dahab-lagouira Of The Kingdom Of Morocco, And Forward Its Recommendation To The Legislature, Pursuant To Section 2293, Hawaii Revised Statutes, For Further Action.
Title
Sister-state; State of Dakhla of the Kingdom of Morocco
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2015-04-30 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-30 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Yamane excused (5). |
2015-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-04-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 657) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-23-15. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1621) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Tokuda. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-15 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to TSI. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 407). |
2015-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward excused (2). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-31-15. |
2015-04-08 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 47 |
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-30 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Choy, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Onishi; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward. |
2015-03-27 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 03-30-15 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2015-03-25 | House | Re-referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR96 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Referred to VMI, referral sheet 33