HI HCR16 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HTH/TEC/HMS.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HTH/TEC/HMS.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Establish A Task Force To Study The Potential Benefits Of Teledentistry For Vulnerable And Underserved Populations In The State And To Identify Barriers To The Practice Of Teledentistry In The State.
Title
Task Force to Study the Potential Benefits of Teledentistry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HTH/TEC/HMS. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 435). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har. |
2014-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-02-14 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-14 at 2:00pm. |
2014-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-27 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-07 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Thielen, Wooley excused (3). |
2014-03-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 908-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro. |
2014-02-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-26-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 9 |
2014-01-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 01-31-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-31-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-23 | House | Offered |
2014-01-21 | House | To be offered. |