HI HCR167 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing A Task Force To Plan And Coordinate The Celebration Of The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts.
Title
Hawaii State Foundation on Culture and the Arts; Task Force
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-17 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 688). |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-17-14. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3426) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-14 9:50AM in conference room 414. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to TEC. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 481). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1477-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Takai, Ohno, McDermott, Wooley. |
2014-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-19-14 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=167&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR167_.HTM |