HI HCR169 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to PSM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to PSM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Veterans' Services, Assisted By The Department Of Accounting And General Services And The Department Of Defense, To Develop A Plan To Create Memorials To The Veterans Of The Persian Gulf War And Women Veterans Of World War Ii On The Grounds Of The State Capitol Near The Korean And Vietnam War Memorial.
Title
Persian Gulf War Veterans; Women Veterans of World War II; Memorial
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to PSM. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 501). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1322-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Carroll, M. Lee, Nishimoto excused. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Takai, Wakai. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 03-11-10 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 42 | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-04 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR105 (Same As) 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.