HI HCR169 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Begin Construction Of The Leeward Bikeway In 2016.
Title
Department of Transportation; Leeward Bikeway
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-25 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3699) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-21-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3660), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Slom. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 04-15-16 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-16 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 456). |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1550-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1401-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-21-16 10:15AM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR119 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=169&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR169_.HTM |