HI HCR172 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) Referred to TIA.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) Referred to TIA.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Importance Of Building A Lasting Relationship And Friendship Between The People Of Hawaii And Yerevan, Armenia.
Title
Yerevan, Armenia; Sister State
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (S) Referred to TIA. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 372). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from INT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1521-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Ward. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by INT on Monday, 04-02-12 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to INT, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR132 (Same As) 2012-04-05 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.