HI HCR176 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Appoint Harbor Agents As Enforcement Officers For The Purposes Of Enforcing Parking Violations At Small Boat Harbors In The State.
Title
Urging The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Appoint Harbor Agents As Enforcement Officers For The Purposes Of Enforcing Parking Violations At Small Boat Harbors In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1). |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR176 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1).
HCR176 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 25
HCR176 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 25