HI HCR179 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR179
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Superintendent Of Education To Request The Board Of Education To Change The Name Of President William Mckinley High School Back To The School's Previous Name Of Honolulu High School And To Remove The Statue Of President Mckinley From The School Premises.
Title
Urging The Superintendent Of Education To Request The Board Of Education To Change The Name Of President William Mckinley High School Back To The School's Previous Name Of Honolulu High School And To Remove The Statue Of President Mckinley From The School Premises.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-18-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 & 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR179 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR148 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR148 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=179&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HCR179_.HTM |