HI HCR179 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reaffirming The Commitment To Increase The State's Affordable Housing Stock By Not Allocating Special Purpose Revenue Bonds And Discouraging The Use Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds.
Title
Reaffirming The Commitment To Increase The State's Affordable Housing Stock By Not Allocating Special Purpose Revenue Bonds And Discouraging The Use Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Micah Aiu [D] | Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Andrew Garrett [D] |
Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 969). |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-23. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1956) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WAM. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 657). |
2023-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2). |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2046), recommending adoption. |
2023-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lamosao, Pierick, Saiki excused (3). |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1606), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Evslin, Kila, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Todd. |
2023-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-22-23 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR184 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.