HI HCR182 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of Statutes And Regulations Related To Prior Authorization Requirements And The Timely Delivery Of Health Care Services In The State And Include An Analysis Of Prior Authorization Reform, With Input Of Data And Feedback From Stakeholders, Including Patient Advocates, Providers, Facilities, And Payers.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of Statutes And Regulations Related To Prior Authorization Requirements And The Timely Delivery Of Health Care Services In The State And Include An Analysis Of Prior Authorization Reform, With Input Of Data And Feedback From Stakeholders, Including Patient Advocates, Providers, Facilities, And Payers.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Andrew Garrett [D] | Rep. Rose Martinez [D] |
Rep. May Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1532-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-27 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Nishimoto. |
2024-03-20 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-24 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-24 at 11:15 AM. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR162 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).