HI HCR185 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of Four Term, Non-exclusive Easements Covering Portions Of State Submerged Lands At Stable Road Beach, Stable Road, Spreckelsville, Wailuku, Maui, For The Use, Maintenance, And Repair Of Four Existing Rock Groins.
Title
Easement; Rock Groin; State Submerged Lands; Stable Road Beach
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2015-04-30 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-30 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Yamane excused (5). |
2015-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-04-27 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 679) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1694) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-23-15 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1618), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-15 2:55PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 414). |
2015-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1416), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1350), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2015-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 03-27-15 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |