HI HCR187 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Paroling Authority To Establish A Hope Parole Pilot Program.
Title
HOPE Parole Pilot Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 637). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) One Day Notice 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3231) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Kidani. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-21-10 1:40PM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to PSM. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 507). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with Tokioka voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-18-10 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 45 | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-08 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR120 (Same As) 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.