HI HCR187 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Convene A Task Force To Clarify And Coordinate Agricultural-based Commercial Support Of Bona-fide Farming Operations Across The State.
Title
Agricultural-Based Commerce Activities Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2015-04-30 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-30 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Yamane excused (5). |
2015-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 649) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-15. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Taniguchi, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-15 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to AGL. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 415). |
2015-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1418), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, DeCoite, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito, Woodson, Ward. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito, Woodson, Ward. |
2015-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Friday, 03-20-15 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR123 (Same As) 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.