HI HCR203 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Promote The Expansion Of Agricultural Commerce.
Title
Agricultural Commerce; Enclosed Country Stores
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-20 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 667). |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-20-16. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported from WLA/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3658) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Espero, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Slom, Galuteria, L. Thielen. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 04-18-16 2:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to WLA/EET. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 467). |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1521-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Woodson, Ward. |
2016-03-17 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2016-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Friday, 03-18-16 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR149 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.