HI HCR207 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR207
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Affirming The Legislature's Commitment To Full And Equal Rights For Women.
Title
Affirming The Legislature's Commitment To Full And Equal Rights For Women.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408), recommending referral to JUD. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR207 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HR135 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HR135 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=207&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR207_.HTM |