HI HCR208 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety And Department Of Accounting And General Services To Study The Feasibility Of Establishing A Public-private Correctional Partnership For The Construction And Operation Of Prisons In Hawaii.
Title
Public-Private Correctional Partnership for Construction and Operation of Prisons in Hawaii; Feasibility Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-05-02 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 690). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) One Day Notice 04-29-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Waived referral to PGM/WAM. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Referred to PGM/WAM. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 629). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1678), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Har, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:30AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1279), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki, Souki. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-24-11 10:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to PBM, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR179 (Same As) 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=208 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR208_.HTM |