HI HCR208 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Lease Certain Submerged Lands At Manele Bay To Coon Brothers Inc. For Renovation Of The Small Boat Harbor Facilities.
Title
Coon Brothers Inc.; Trinity; Manele Small Boat Harbor ; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Berth 24;
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-01 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, McKelvey excused (2). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1276), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Monday, 03-25-13 8:45AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=208&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR208_.HTM |