HI HCR208 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Each County To Develop A Comprehensive Integrated Wastewater Management Plan And Financial Strategy To Upgrade, Convert, Or Connect Cesspools Located Within Its Respective Jurisdiction By 2050.
Title
Requesting Each County To Develop A Comprehensive Integrated Wastewater Management Plan And Financial Strategy To Upgrade, Convert, Or Connect Cesspools Located Within Its Respective Jurisdiction By 2050.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-20 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 927). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-20-23. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1922) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 511). |
2023-03-30 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-30 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3). |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1756) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2023-03-28 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2023-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-28-23 10:45AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-22 | House | Re-referred to EEP, referral sheet 23 |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR212 (Same As) 2023-03-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Cesspools
COMPREHENSIVE INTEGRATED WASTEWATER MANAGEMENT PLAN AND FINANCIAL STRATEGY
Conversion
Counties
Report
COMPREHENSIVE INTEGRATED WASTEWATER MANAGEMENT PLAN AND FINANCIAL STRATEGY
Conversion
Counties
Report