HI HCR211 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii College Of Social Sciences Public Policy Center And Spark M. Matsunaga Institute For Peace And Conflict Resolution To Collaborate With State Agencies And Advocacy Organizations To Develop A Comprehensive Plan That Coordinates Statewide Policies And Services For Victims And Survivors Of Human Trafficking In Hawaii.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from HUS/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1466-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Souki, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Saiki. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS/LAB on Thursday, 03-29-12 9:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to HUS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |