HI HCR212 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Recommitted to HUS with none voting no and Representative(s) Ching, Chong, Kawakami, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Recommitted to HUS with none voting no and Representative(s) Ching, Chong, Kawakami, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Human Services To Consider Implementing A Computer Application For Foster Youth Who Are Transitioning Out Of The Foster Care System.
Title
Department of Human Services; Foster Youth; My Safe Drawer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Recommitted to HUS with none voting no and Representative(s) Ching, Chong, Kawakami, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1680) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Marumoto, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:35AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 03-28-11 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR183 (Same As) 2011-04-15 - (H) Recommitted to HUS with none voting no and Representative(s) Ching, Chong, Kawakami, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused.