HI HCR29 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Support Continued Funding Of The Affordable Connectivity Program.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Support Continued Funding Of The Affordable Connectivity Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 735). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-24. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Reported from LBT/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3885) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to LBT/GVO. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to LBT/PSM. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 600). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1733-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-27 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9). |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1397-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2024-03-05 | House | Offered |
2024-03-01 | House | To be offered. |