HI HCR38 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Takai, Thielen excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Takai, Thielen excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education To Create Policies Allowing Charter Schools To Use Vacant Classrooms And Schools That Will Be Closed.
Title
Vacant Classrooms; Closed Schools; Charter School Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Takai, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1055-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Takumi, Berg, Bertram, Chang, Hanohano, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Takai, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Manahan, Yamane, Ching. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-17-10 2:05PM in conference room 309. | |
2010-02-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-17-10 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 11 | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2010-01-25 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR63 (Same As) 2010-01-29 - (S) Referred to EDH.