HI HCR5 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study To Identify Measures Used To Determine Whether Sex Offender Registration Laws Are Achieving Their Goals And Objectives And Requesting The Attorney General To Apply The Identified Measures To Criminal Justice Data On Registered Sex Offenders In Hawaii And Determine Whether Hawaii Sex Offender Registration Laws Are Being Implemented In The Way They Were Intended And Are Meeting Their Goals And Objectives.
Title
Study; State Sex Offender Laws; Objectives and Implementation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 575). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Carroll, Chong, M. Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1615) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, B. Oshiro. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-07-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Cabanilla, Har excused. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Yamane, Pine. | |
2011-03-07 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-10-11 10:45AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2011-01-27 | (H) To be offered. |