HI HCR5 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to PGM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Government Operations, and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to PGM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Government Operations, and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requests the United States Congress to recognize that corporations are not entitled to Constitutional rights and that the Constitution only grants rights to natural persons. (HCR 5 HD1)
Title
Requests the United States Congress to recognize that corporations are not entitled to Constitutional rights and that the Constitution only grants rights to natural persons. (HCR 5 HD1)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to PGM/JDL. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 556). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with Ching, Fontaine, Pine, Ward voting aye with reservations; Marumoto voting no (1) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1701-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Giugni, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Har, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ching voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Ito. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-08-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Offered | |
2012-01-19 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR5 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.