HI HCR51 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR51
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 938).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 938).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Prioritize Funding For Air Conditioning In Schools On Hawaii Island That Are Regularly Affected By Vog.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Prioritize Funding For Air Conditioning In Schools On Hawaii Island That Are Regularly Affected By Vog.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 938). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-29-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4070) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-25-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 423). |
2022-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-22 3:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1622-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ohno. |
2022-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-10 | House | Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR46 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR51 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HCR51 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).