HI HCR52 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation To Implement The Collaboration Of Community Hospitals With Community Health Centers, And To Develop A Plan To Integrate Certain Rural Hospitals With Federally-qualified Health Centers.
Title
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | (H) The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-27-12 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 35 | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Offered | |
2012-02-17 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR31 (Same As) 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=52 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HCR52_.HTM |