HI HCR54 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR54
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Enactment Of Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board To Construe Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, In Accordance With Tradition.
Title
Recognizing The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Enactment Of Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board To Construe Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, In Accordance With Tradition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-27 | House | Offered |
2020-02-26 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR39 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR54 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR54 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=54&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR54_.HTM |