HI HCR54 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR54
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Enact Legislation To Address The Rise In Illegal Text Messages.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Enact Legislation To Address The Rise In Illegal Text Messages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-10 | House | Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR49 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR54 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR26 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR54 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR26 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=54&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR54_.HTM |