HI HCR56 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR56
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Reinstate The Ban On The Manufacture, Transfer, And Possession Of The Ar-15 Rifle And Other Civilian Weapons That Were Designed For Military Use.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Reinstate The Ban On The Manufacture, Transfer, And Possession Of The Ar-15 Rifle And Other Civilian Weapons That Were Designed For Military Use.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-06 | House | Offered |
2018-03-02 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR43 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 39
HCR56 (Carry Over) 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR56 (Carry Over) 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=56&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR56_.HTM |