HI HCR57 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Endorse The "screen At 23" Campaign That Screens Adult Asian Americans For Type 2 Diabetes At A Body Mass Index Of 23.
Title
Body Mass Index; Asian American Residents; Diabetes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-24-16 10:15AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2016-03-03 | House | Offered |
2016-03-02 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR24 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=57&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR57_.HTM |