HI HCR61 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-12 - (S) Referred to WLH.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-12 - (S) Referred to WLH.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
In Support Of Declaring The Serpent's Head Cowry Shell As The Hawaii State Sea Shell.
Title
Serpent's Head Cowry Shell; State Shell
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | (S) Referred to WLH. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 364). | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Adopted with Riviere voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Hanohano, Thielen excused (3). | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1514-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 03-30-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Referred to WLO, referral sheet 38 | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Offered | |
2012-02-23 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR41 (Same As) 2012-04-04 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.