HI HCR61 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR61
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Report To The Legislature On Its Progress Toward Providing A Well-rounded Education For All Public School Students.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Report To The Legislature On Its Progress Toward Providing A Well-rounded Education For All Public School Students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1786), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Tokioka, Okimoto. |
2019-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
2019-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR61 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR62 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR62 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=61&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR61_.HTM |