HI HCR72 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging Single-family Residence Builders To Consider Certain Factors That Will Facilitate Installation Of Photovoltaic Systems When Constructing And Developing Single-family Residences.
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Energy Systems; Construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | (H) The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/HSG on Tuesday, 03-27-12 11:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Referred to EEP/HSG, referral sheet 40 | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-01 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR61 (Same As) 2012-04-16 - (H) Referred to EEP/HSG, CPC, referral sheet 66
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=72 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HCR72_.HTM |