HI HCR78 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR78
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services, In Coordination With The Department Of Agriculture, To Implement Birth Control Strategies To Curtail The Pigeon Population At The State Capitol And Surrounding Areas.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services, In Coordination With The Department Of Agriculture, To Implement Birth Control Strategies To Curtail The Pigeon Population At The State Capitol And Surrounding Areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR71 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
HCR78 (Carry Over) 2021-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR78 (Carry Over) 2021-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=78&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR78_.HTM |