HI HCR80 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR80
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii State Archives To Curate And Make Publicly Available The Harry B. Soria, Jr., And Kilohana Silve Collection.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii State Archives To Curate And Make Publicly Available The Harry B. Soria, Jr., And Kilohana Silve Collection.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR80 (Carry Over) 2021-04-09 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=80&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR80_.HTM |