HI HCR81 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Amend Title 12, Chapter 15, Hawaii Administrative Rules, To Clarify That Compensation For Advanced Practice Registered Nurses Under The State's Workers' Compensation Law Is Distinct From Compensation For Registered Nurses And Shall Be One Hundred Percent Of The Fees Authorized Under The Medicare Fee Schedule.
Title
Requesting The Director Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Amend Title 12, Chapter 15, Hawaii Administrative Rules, To Clarify That Compensation For Advanced Practice Registered Nurses Under The State's Workers' Compensation Law Is Distinct From Compensation For Registered Nurses And Shall Be One Hundred Percent Of The Fees Authorized Under The Medicare Fee Schedule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 741). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-24. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Reported from LBT/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3886) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Awa. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-24 10:20AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to LBT/HHS. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1684-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1493-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Martinez, Alcos. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 03-21-24 10:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2024-03-07 | House | Offered |
2024-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR66 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.