HI HCR82 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR82
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Lahaina, Maui, For The Maintenance And Repair Of The Existing Concrete Seawall, And For The Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Lahaina, Maui, For The Maintenance And Repair Of The Existing Concrete Seawall, And For The Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1453), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:35AM in conference room 312. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-09 | House | Offered |
2017-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR82 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
BLNR
Concrete Seawall
Issuance of a Term, Non-Exclusive Easement
State Submerged Lands at Lahaina, Maui
Concrete Seawall
Issuance of a Term, Non-Exclusive Easement
State Submerged Lands at Lahaina, Maui
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=82&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR82_.HTM |