HI HCR9 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR9
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Social And Financial Assessment Of Proposed Mandatory Health Insurance Coverage For Various Sexual And Reproductive Health Care Services.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Social And Financial Assessment Of Proposed Mandatory Health Insurance Coverage For Various Sexual And Reproductive Health Care Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1595-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2022-03-29 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 9 |
2022-02-01 | House | Offered |
2022-01-31 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR6 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR9 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
SCR62 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
HCR9 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
SCR62 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
Subjects
Auditor
Impact Assessment Report
Mandatory Health Insurance Coverage
Sexual and Reproductive Health Care Services
Impact Assessment Report
Mandatory Health Insurance Coverage
Sexual and Reproductive Health Care Services