HI HCR94 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Expand A School Garden Program Statewide.
Title
Task Force; School Garden Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1473-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Chang, Hanohano, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Takai, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Mizuno, Saiki, Wooley. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 04-02-12 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from HLT/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1372-12), recommending referral to EDN. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Nishimoto. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Pine. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/AGR on Tuesday, 03-27-12 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Referred to HLT/AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 44 | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-09 | (H) To be offered. |