HI HCR97 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR97
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Federal Aviation Administration To Advocate The Enactment Of The Federal Legislation Establishing The "safe And Quiet Skies Act Of 2019" And Vigorously Enforce It When It Becomes Law.
Title
Urging The Federal Aviation Administration To Advocate The Enactment Of The Federal Legislation Establishing The "safe And Quiet Skies Act Of 2019" And Vigorously Enforce It When It Becomes Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR79 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 40
HCR97 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR97 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=97&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR97_.HTM |