HI HR101 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR101
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism And Department Of Agriculture To Make Recommendations Regarding A Statewide Program To Address Agricultural Theft.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism And Department Of Agriculture To Make Recommendations Regarding A Statewide Program To Address Agricultural Theft.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2048), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2019-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from EDB/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1799), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Quinlan. |
2019-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB/AGR on Friday, 03-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to EDB/AGR, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR101 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR107 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 905) in amended form (SD 1).
HCR107 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 905) in amended form (SD 1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=101&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR101_.HTM |