HI HR109 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Chairperson Of The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Establish A Coastal Memorials Task Force.
Title
Coastal Memorials Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with Fale, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1681), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-01 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Jordan voting aye with reservations; Coffman voting no (1) and Kawakami, McKelvey excused (2). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1277), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Evans, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, Fale; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Coffman; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Hanohano, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, Fale; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Coffman; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Monday, 03-25-13 8:45AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR139 (Same As) 2013-04-15 - Referred to WTL/PSM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=109&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR109_.HTM |