HI HR110 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Designate The Honor And Remember Flag As A National Symbol Of Our Nation's Concern And Commitment To Honoring And Remembering The Lives Of All Members Of The Us Armed Forces Who Have Lost Their Lives In The Line Of Duty.
Title
Honor and Remember Flag
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Takai, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1074-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Takai, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Wakai, Ward. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 03-25-10 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Referred to EBM, referral sheet 45 | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-05 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR175 (Same As) 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.